Andrew Schick - Teams Played Against
Team | Games | Tries | Goals | DropGoals | Points | First Game Against | Last Game Against |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barrow Raiders | 2 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 05 Apr 1999 | 08 Aug 1999 |
Batley Bulldogs | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 30 May 1999 | 30 May 1999 |
Bradford Bulls | 7 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 31 Mar 1996 | 31 Aug 1998 |
Bramley | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 21 Feb 1999 | 21 Feb 1999 |
Chorley/Blackpool | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 25 Apr 1999 | 29 Aug 1999 |
Dewsbury Rams | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 14 Mar 1999 | 11 Jul 1999 |
Doncaster | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 20 Jun 1999 | 20 Jun 1999 |
Featherstone Rovers | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 02 Apr 1999 | 02 Apr 1999 |
Halifax Panthers | 7 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 09 Apr 1996 | 09 Aug 1998 |
Huddersfield Giants | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 14 Jun 1998 | 20 Sep 1998 |
Hull FC | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 10 May 1998 | 16 Aug 1998 |
Hull Kingston Rovers | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 06 Jun 1999 | 06 Jun 1999 |
Hunslet | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 13 Jun 1999 | 13 Jun 1999 |
Hunter Mariners | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 13 Jun 1997 | 20 Jul 1997 |
Leeds Rhinos | 7 | 3 | 0 | 0 | 12 | 05 Apr 1996 | 02 Aug 1998 |
Leigh Leopards | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 18 Apr 1999 | 22 Aug 1999 |
London Broncos | 6 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 19 May 1996 | 27 Sep 1998 |
Oldham | 4 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 14 Jul 1996 | 09 May 1999 |
Paris Saint-Germain | 3 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 07 Jun 1996 | 05 Jul 1997 |
Perth Reds | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 08 Jun 1997 | 08 Jun 1997 |
Rochdale Hornets | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 23 Jun 1999 | 23 Jun 1999 |
Salford Red Devils | 2 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 09 Feb 1997 | 06 Sep 1998 |
Sheffield Eagles | 6 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 03 May 1996 | 10 Apr 1998 |
St. Helens | 7 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 04 Feb 1996 | 13 Sep 1998 |
Swinton Lions | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 16 May 1999 | 16 May 1999 |
Warrington Wolves | 7 | 2 | 0 | 0 | 8 | 31 May 1996 | 22 Aug 1998 |
Whitehaven | 2 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 21 Mar 1999 | 18 Jul 1999 |
Widnes Vikings | 3 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 14 Feb 1999 | 15 Aug 1999 |
Wigan Warriors | 5 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 14 Apr 1996 | 28 Jun 1998 |
Workington Town | 3 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 4 | 12 May 1996 | 23 May 1999 |
York Knights | 1 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 0 | 07 Mar 1999 | 07 Mar 1999 |